Financial history BECKMINSTER METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1128871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £89.06k £113.34k £152.73k £107.67k £132.84k
Total expenditure £103.19k £107.16k £116.28k £106.33k £113.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A