THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE GLASCOTE & STONYDELPH TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion in the parish the whole mission of the church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

17 Trustee(s)
172 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- GLASCOTE & STONYDELPH PCC (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marion Lincoln | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Temple | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Cooley | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Joyce Thorpe | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharron Gray | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Shaw | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Judge | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVD Gary Simmons | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Baker | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marie Richards | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deacon Gill Judge | Trustee | 06 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
REV PAT FAULTLESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA ROSE LUKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LEIGH DIANE BULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS. PAT WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR DAVE FAULTLESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev MICHAEL RAYMOND LE-WORTHY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.69k | £203.37k | £180.44k | £214.14k | £242.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £213.17k | £201.41k | £165.64k | £188.24k | £212.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.20k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFNED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. George's Vicarage
86 Bamford Street
TAMWORTH
B77 2AS
- Phone:
- 01827 62612
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window