Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT MARY OATLANDS

Charity Number: 1128836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £150.42k £172.95k £238.08k £188.07k £183.65k
Total expenditure £246.65k £200.23k £264.96k £189.54k £221.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.51k N/A £17.00k N/A £5.95k