OSWESTRY METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relgious Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
Governance
- 20 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JULIA DAWN SKITT | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Ann Horsley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham Horsley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ward | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
IAN SKAIFE | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Edlington Mr | Trustee | 23 December 2012 |
|
|||||
CLLR MARTIN BENNETT | Trustee |
|
||||||
JUDITH SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
DORIS MARY BEAMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER HAZEL ANSTEY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER EILEEN WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNIFER ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.51k | £127.20k | £153.38k | £141.97k | £163.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.22k | £139.48k | £153.14k | £137.84k | £166.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Portland Crescent
SHREWSBURY
SY2 5NL
- Phone:
- 01743353611
- Email:
- angela.wadey@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window