THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN'S, WALTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship.Pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved.Teaching of Christianity. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings and distribution of literature.Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.Supporting charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. JOHN'S PCC, WALTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nick Green | Chair | 25 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Case | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Smith | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Clifford Davies | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DONALD WALKER | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Curtis Jay Gadsby | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Fisher | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Stanners | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Harbidge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Macleod | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Maurice Cartledge | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Janet Lisa Cresswell | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bailey | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alan Platt | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Abbott | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.88k | £167.48k | £159.70k | £465.23k | £200.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.68k | £141.42k | £136.13k | £241.85k | £185.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church
Walton Back Lane
Walton
CHESTERFIELD
Derbyshire
S42 7LT
- Phone:
- 01246 566205
- Email:
- office@stjohnswalton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window