THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH VIRGINIA WATER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Church Parochial Church Council has the responsibility of promoting the whole mission of the Church - pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has oversight of the financial affairs of Christ Church Virginia Water and maintenance responsibilities for the buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
79 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH VIRGINIA WATER PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Simon David Newman Vibert Dr | Chair | 18 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Beverley Jane Gilbert | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Payne | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Paula Hall | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Blain | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Perkins | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Parker | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Smith | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Andew Blain | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin David James Stannard | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Julie Unwin BA HONS | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Akeel Husein Kurban Sachak | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Rodney John Whitehead | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jeremy Wallace Brown | Trustee | 04 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.40k | £443.77k | £437.84k | £442.28k | £1.09m | |
|
Total expenditure | £566.79k | £426.92k | £456.92k | £424.42k | £515.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £619.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.04m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £15.28k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £25.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £34.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £13.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £625.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £566.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £380.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £95 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.13k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £68.26k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £247.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £273.12k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £690.00k | |
|
Other assets | £300.48k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £192.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £10.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £26.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRIST CHURCH
CHRISTCHURCH ROAD
VIRGINIA WATER
GU25 4PT
- Phone:
- 01344844946
- Email:
- office@cc-vw.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window