Financial history ARNOLD METHODIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1128841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £97.24k £61.81k £76.18k £106.53k £101.54k
Total expenditure £90.45k £73.60k £79.03k £91.01k £102.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A