THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOKE-NEXT-GUILDFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship, prayer and bible teaching. Pastoral care for church members and those living in the parish. Activities for children, young people & local students. Support to Christian organisations, other charities in Guildford, overseas missions & relief agencies. Maintenance of the Church and the Stirling Centre to provide facilities for these activities and for use by the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 06 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S STOKE-NEXT GUILDFORD PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND MARK CHRISTIAN WOODWARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nadejda Efimovna Maclachlan | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christina Susan Thomas | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tait McKenzie | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Robson | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sydney Olufemi Bernard Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Joseph Cutler | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christine Sally Mogford | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Barnardo | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Curran | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Anthony Maclachlan | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Turner | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR SIMON LOVELESS | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £226.39k | £221.98k | £231.35k | £253.93k | £360.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £241.76k | £203.20k | £227.36k | £283.64k | £295.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 December 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o St. Johns Church
Stoke Road
GUILDFORD
GU1 1HB
- Phone:
- 01483574562
- Email:
- office@stjohnstoke.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window