Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SEALE, PUTTENHAM & WANBOROUGH

Charity Number: 1129466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev STEPHEN BERT THATCHER Chair 22 February 2018
None on record
Jennifer Proctor Trustee 13 May 2025
None on record
Lisanne Maxted Trustee 03 February 2025
None on record
Kathleen McAnear Smith Trustee 31 July 2024
None on record
Mary Claire Cook Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Sally Anne Cooper Trustee 24 May 2023
None on record
Caroline Mary Warburton Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Dr David Nisbet Wilson MBE Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Dr David Murray Melville Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
Christopher William Biddell Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
DEE BRAMLEY Trustee 22 April 2015
WANBOROUGH (SURREY) VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
ANNE CONCANEN Trustee
None on record
ANN PAYNE SRN Trustee
None on record