Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARLINGTON, PORTSMOUTH
Charity number: 1129921

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL DAVID GULLY | Chair | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Upton | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Rev Deborah Susan Vears | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE WELLS | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL GEORGE HORNER | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Ann Watkins | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip John Sampson | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edwin John Mather | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marina Horner | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander Jempson | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edward Purser | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS SAUNDERS | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon Lemieux | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.