FIRING LINE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Firing Line is a joint Regimental Museum of 1st The Queen's Dragoon Guards and The Royal Welsh. Officially opened by HRH Charles, Prince of Wales in June 2010. It is open to the public 362 days of the year and shows the two regiment's history over the past 350 years. Interactive and educational for all ages, it has temporary exhibitions 3 times a year and also has changing gallery displays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £321,340 from 1 government contract(s) and £24,004 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 08 April 2009: Standard registration
- 04 June 2015: Funds received from 257665 CARDIFF CALEDONIAN SOCIETY TRUST FUND
- CARDIFF CASTLE MUSEUM OF THE WELSH SOLDIER (Working name)
- FIRING LINE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard James Parfitt Dennis | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL JEREMY EAMON DOUGLAS PUGHE-MORGAN | Trustee | 14 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Gareth Robert Hughes | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD CAMPBELL SMITH | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier David Wheeler | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER ALAN STEWART RICHMOND OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £444.46k | £433.44k | £353.49k | £336.27k | £415.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £411.58k | £307.66k | £312.99k | £421.92k | £344.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £347.93k | N/A | £141.40k | £244.79k | £321.34k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £217.61k | £109.95k | £23.08k | £24.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 APR 2022 as amended on 24 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY, IN EACH CASE ONLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF: I. QDG AND ITS ANTECEDENT AND SUCCESSOR REGIMENTS; AND II. R WELSH AND ITS ANTECEDENT AND SUCCESSOR REGIMENTS, IN PARTICULAR TO MAINTAIN A MILITARY MUSEUM AND ARCHIVE AND TO PRESERVE AND EXHIBIT TO THE PUBLIC THOSE ARTEFACTS AND ASSETS WHICH ARE ON LOAN FROM THE QDG, THE R WELSH AND THEIR RESPECTIVE MUSEUM TRUSTS (“THE COLLECTION”); (B) TO PROMOTE AN AWARENESS OF THE HISTORY AND ROLE OF THE ARMED FORCES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ESPECIALLY THE QDG AND R WELSH, WITH AN AIM OF PROMOTING AN INTEREST AND INVOLVEMENT BY THE PUBLIC WITH BOTH REGIMENTS; AND FURTHER ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION BY ENGAGING WITH THE ARMED FORCES AND VETERAN COMMUNITY IN WALES. NOTHING IN THESE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY STATUTORY PROVISION REGARDING THE MEANING OF THE WORD ‘CHARITABLE’, OR THE WORDS ‘CHARITABLE PURPOSES’, IN FORCE IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Firing Line Museum
Cardiff Castle Grounds
CARDIFF
CF10 3RB
- Phone:
- 02920788370
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window