THE COVENTRY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote high standards of planning, urban design and architecture in or affecting Coventry. To preserve and to promote understanding and appreciation of the built landscape and environmental heritage and the history of Coventry. To hold meetings, lectures and exhibitions. To educate public opinion and give appropriate advice and information to enable active citizenship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 03 August 1970: Standard registration
- THE COVENTRY CIVIC AMENITY SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Robert Porter | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Prevc | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Fry | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Timothy John Brown | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Goodman | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Aaron James Law | Trustee | 12 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Cornfoot | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER WALTERS | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|||||
James Passmore | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PAYNE | Trustee | 16 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MADDOCKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70k | £1.69k | £3.03k | £2.36k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.76k | £1.58k | £2.64k | £2.38k | £2.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 1970 AND AMENDED 2 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 03 APR 2006 AS AMENDED ON 08 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 10 DEC 2018 as amended on 12 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE CITY OF COVENTRY (I) TO PROMOTE THE ENVIRONMENTAL, SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL IMPROVEMENT OF COVENTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE LIVING AND WORKING HERE. (II) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING, URBAN DESIGN AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING COVENTRY (III) TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE BUILT, LANDSCAPE AND ENVIRONMENTAL HERITAGE AND HISTORY OF COVENTRY (IV) TO PROMOTE HIGH QUALITY PUBLIC AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR THE PEOPLE OF COVENTRY (V) TO PROMOTE HARMONIOUS RELATIONS AMONG THE COMMUNITY OF ALL RACES, BELIEFS AND CULTURES IN COVENTRY
Area of benefit
COVENTRY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Old Winnings Road
Keresley End
COVENTRY
CV7 8JL
- Phone:
- 02476403389
- Email:
- info@coventrysociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window