THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTHLAKE ST JAMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work inc. visiting the sick & bereaved. Teaching Christianity through sermons, courses & small groups. Provision of local youth clubs with a Christian ethos. Working with staff in local schools to deliver RE & assemblies. Mission & evangelism. Supporting charities in UK & overseas. Education and training for Christian and community service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES-ÇÖ CHURCH CENTRE PCC, SOUTHLAKE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Laurence Robert Smith | Chair | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Edward Penny | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Edward Robinson | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Lord BA | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sukha Ranjan Debnath | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Dawn Litchfield BAEd/DIPEd | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine June Clarke BA | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Morven Mullens | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Caroline Hawkes | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Sarah Turton BA HONS | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Tivey | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PETER ROBIN CLARKE | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Fulford | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID FULFORD PHD MIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £271.15k | £223.11k | £219.01k | £172.79k | £170.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.30k | £210.00k | £247.13k | £226.56k | £178.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. James Church
Kingfisher Drive
Woodley
READING
RG5 3LH
- Phone:
- 01189662568
- Email:
- office@stjameswoodley.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window