Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON

Charity Number: 1128665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £343.71k £474.12k £524.68k £721.15k £766.48k
Total expenditure £450.70k £473.29k £497.47k £611.15k £800.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.88k N/A £29.57k £6.73k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £334.99k £330.38k £384.01k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £162.17k £349.02k £330.49k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £27.52k £37.25k £51.98k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £4.49k £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £17.88k £13.33k £52.35k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £334.57k £397.13k £552.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £162.90k £214.02k £247.97k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £62.25k £74.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £12.48k £7.72k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0