ST JOHN'S METHODIST CHURCH LLANDUDNO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church is engaged in promoting the mission of the Methodist Church. It fulfills this role through worship, pastoral care and learning, outreach to the local community and wider world, and links with other denominations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

23 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
Governance
- 31 March 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
23 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Rodgers | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Preston | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Styan | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Barratt | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Deacon Janet Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rita Johnson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Gordon | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Price | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hilda Linda Harper | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY JONES | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANET HUGHES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Conway | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Hollands | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
LINDA HARPER | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
VAL CONWAY | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE MORRELL | Trustee | 04 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BENNETT | Trustee | 26 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Graham Tovey | Trustee | 01 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
CERI RHIAN SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER NOEL ACKERLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EVELYN ELIZABETH CONWAY BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH ANN MARY SMALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.07k | £130.64k | £77.97k | £135.04k | £114.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £199.73k | £225.93k | £78.82k | £88.41k | £119.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Methodist Church
53-55 Mostyn Street
LLANDUDNO
LL30 2NN
- Phone:
- 01492860439
- Email:
- stjohnsllandudno@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window