THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CREDITON

Charity Number: 1129124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £179,807
Total expenditure: £176,317

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • HOLY CROSS PCC, CREDITON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd Prebendary Matthew John Tregenza Chair 04 March 2019
THE POSBURY ST FRANCIS TRUST
Received: On time
HAYWARDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Michael John May Trustee 09 April 2025
None on record
Martin Heinrich Donnevert Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Margaret Elizabeth Jellis Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
David James Owen Trustee 10 April 2024
None on record
Jane Patricia Welby Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Sandra Marion Collier Trustee 19 April 2023
None on record
Antonia Emma Elisabeth Tregenza Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Peter Lawrence Bunn Trustee 06 April 2022
THE FRIENDS OF CREDITON CHURCH
Received: On time
Deborah Ilby Bunn Trustee 06 April 2022
None on record
Joanna Lunnon Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Peter Nigel Brewer Trustee 11 April 2018
CREDITON PARISH CHURCH MUSIC ENDOWMENT FUND
Received: On time
Carolyn Price Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Anne Caroline Jerman Trustee
None on record
Gillian Frances Lee Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £144.48k £135.57k £159.85k £180.16k £179.81k
Total expenditure £144.74k £126.49k £148.79k £176.32k £176.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 05 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Boniface Centre
Church Lane
Crediton
EX17 2AH
Phone:
01363773226