THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES PADDINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an Anglican church, near the centre of London, and we welcome worshippers and visitors from all over London and from many parts of the world. As part of the Church of England, St James's is an inclusive church and is pleased to be able to offer hospitality to everyone.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 04 March 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES'S SUSSEX GARDENS, PADDINGTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy John Handley | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Rev William Daniel Allen | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Sir David O'Grady Roche | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Dena Marshall | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Sean Chan | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Adrian Robert Burgering | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Zachary Joseph Barnett | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Alexandria Tokarska | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID CHARLES JOHN BANKS | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Sir David Madel | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Lorna Anne Harrison | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Oluwatosin Opsyemi Ajayi | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Jonathan Crawford | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Lesley Hetherington | Trustee | 26 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Robert Lloyd | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN GEOFFREY GORDON MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARY MARGARET CATHERINE LAMBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £382.90k | £312.87k | £337.05k | £338.58k | £387.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £333.20k | £317.34k | £397.29k | £365.34k | £393.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES'S CHURCH
SUSSEX GARDENS
LONDON
W2 3UD
- Phone:
- 02072629976
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window