THE HERITAGE STEAMBOAT TRUST

Charity number: 1129799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support for The Tamesis Trust. Work on digitising the Steam Boat Association collection of archive photos and drawings. Raise funds to support historic steamboat conservation work Help train and educate people in the skills needed for operating steam launch machinery Educate people about the history of steam launches

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 20 May 2024

Total income: £100
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 May 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SBA TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN Watson SMITH Chair
THE CONSUTA TRUST
Received: On time
THE TAMESIS TRUST
Received: On time
Dorothy Ann Bullough Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
CAPTAIN ADRIAN BIRTLES Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
MIKE BELL Trustee
None on record
BRIAN HILLSDON Trustee
None on record
RICHARD HAVARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/05/2020 20/05/2021 20/05/2022 20/05/2023 20/05/2024
Total gross income £173 £233 £322 £278 £100
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 May 2024 02 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 20 May 2023 13 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 20 May 2022 25 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 20 May 2021 13 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 May 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
19 MILLBANK
KINTBURY
HUNGERFORD
RG17 9UW
Phone:
01488658795