THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, PRESTWOOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work, including visiting sick and bereaved Teaching Christianity Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 21 April 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PRESTWOOD PCC (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DEINIOL JOHN OWEN HEYWOOD M PHIL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Ann Wickham | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Monica McLean | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Jolly | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Fallon | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Joan Rolfe-Dickinson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Goldsmith | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Paterson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nigel Christopher Oliver Spoor | Trustee | 22 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hart | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Doran | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Nigel Bicknell | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean Green | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Bicknell | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.71k | £157.70k | £152.81k | £160.52k | £167.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.95k | £147.15k | £162.36k | £160.54k | £164.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
140 Wycombe Road
Prestwood
Great Missenden
HP16 0HJ
- Phone:
- 01494866530
- Email:
- RECTOR@HTPRESTWOOD.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window