Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. ALKMUND'S, WHITCHURCH. SHROPSHIRE.
Charity number: 1129900

Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Chris Precious | Chair | 10 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Robert Chapman | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Sarah Radford | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Lynne Bowden | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Philippa Alice White | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Linda Martin | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Hilda Francis-Roberrs | Trustee | 02 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Jane Rylands | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
Sheila Chase | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN CASTLEDINE | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PAULINE STOKES | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||
ELAINE BUCKNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
JOHN WALTER STOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.