LEYLAND METHODIST CHURCH, LEYLAND, LANCASHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Methodist Church in Leyland offering worship, bible study and community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

20 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Howard | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Daniel Parkinson | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ryan Francis Scott | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
SETH ASIAW | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Adele Frances Whittingham | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Elizabeth Adams | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Annette Cupit | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Stephen William Austin | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
James Anthony Blackledge | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Baker | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
KATHRYN ELIZABETH TOWNSON | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Enid Hallam | Trustee | 01 September 1998 |
|
|
||||||
ANNIE CRABTREE CERT. ED | Trustee | 01 September 1997 |
|
|
||||||
JEFF WHITTLE | Trustee | 01 September 1996 |
|
|
||||||
ANN DIGGLES SRN | Trustee | 01 September 1995 |
|
|
||||||
MABEL HARRIS | Trustee | 01 September 1994 |
|
|
||||||
YVONNE TAYLOR | Trustee | 01 September 1991 |
|
|
||||||
BRYAN NOON ACIB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EILLEN TOMLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
CAROL ECCLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.79k | £160.84k | £352.26k | £162.74k | £172.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.79k | £178.46k | £329.46k | £155.04k | £193.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leyland Methodist Church
Turpin Green Lane
LEYLAND
PR25 3HA
- Phone:
- 01772452572
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window