PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANNE HIGHGATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prayer, liturgy, worship and music, in the Catholic tradition of the Church of England, with a welcoming congregation in a beautiful building. Eucharist (with Children's Church) Sunday 1030am. Regular programmes of support for charities in the neighbourhood and elsewhere, community lunches, social outreach events, and musical events organised by the church and by groups who hire the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Camden
Governance
- 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC ST ANNE'S HIGHGATE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVD ANDREW JOHN BRUCE MELDRUM LLB, MA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
michael Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Yvonne Compton | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Partin | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Taylor | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARION RUSHBROOK | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Carola Darwin | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marian Donne | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gus Amadi | Trustee | 31 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Prof Coral Ann Howells | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROLAND ZLOWODZKI DE CHOLEWA | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR MARY SIMONS | Trustee | 16 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
REVD SIMON PAUL WALSH BA FRSA | Trustee | 07 March 2012 |
|
|||||
BARBARA RUTH ROSS MA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.14k | £96.42k | £122.33k | £120.18k | £190.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.13k | £95.32k | £75.42k | £88.77k | £230.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 November 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Anne C Of E Church
Highgate West Hill
LONDON
N6 6AP
- Phone:
- 02030157057
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window