Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST THOMAS, OAKWOOD

Charity number: 1129369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £273.83k £264.97k £277.00k £305.52k £349.61k
Total expenditure £268.79k £300.72k £275.79k £258.19k £308.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.82k £1.62k N/A N/A N/A