THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S, MAIDENHEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main purpose is the provision of a Place of Worship for the local community, this is done through services held at the church. We also carry out work within the community through our Outreach Programme. There is an ongoing programme to provide support to both UK Based Charities and other Charities throughout the World.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 03 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. LUKE'S PCC, MAIDENHEAD (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev SALLY MARGARET LYNCH | Chair | 17 August 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||
Fiona Leonard | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Emma Cameron | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
James Ellins | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|||||||||||||
Kim Rumble | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dee Lanyon | Trustee | 02 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARGARET GIBBON | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
BEV BOTTING | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
KATTY KING | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RALPH HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MARC CAPORICCIO | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CLARE PRICE | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
JACQUELINE ANNABEL LEWIS | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
RUTH ELIZABETH SHEPPARD | Trustee | 03 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.13k | £133.82k | £379.35k | £127.67k | £135.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.62k | £133.87k | £119.31k | £163.42k | £168.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
ST LUKE'S CHURCH
26 NORFOLK ROAD
MAIDENHEAD
BERKS
- Phone:
- 01628783033
- Email:
- STLUKES.PCCSEC@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window