THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, HAMMERSMITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote in the parish, the whole mission of the Church encompassing pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical functions. It is also responsible for the maintenance and development of the church building. The PCC seeks to implement the Church's agreed vision statement: Shaped by God to Shape the City.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,250,045
Donations and legacies | £900.29k | |
Charitable activities | £325.01k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £5.65k | |
Other | £19.09k |
Total expenditure:
£1,172,282
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.17m | |
Retained for future use | £77.76k |
People

16 Employee(s)
18 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST PAUL'S HAMMERSMITH (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Peter Wynter | Chair | 17 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Stewart | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joel Wallington | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|||||
James Haley | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Toms | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Eniola Akodu | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadia Vermaak | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Wooldridge | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Asimolowo | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sam Stephens | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Nnamdi Nwaneri | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Law | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Opara | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Barker | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Graves | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Evans | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Bell | Trustee | 06 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR VIVIAN IVOR THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.31m | £977.89k | £1.04m | £1.27m | £1.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31m | £1.00m | £844.27k | £1.01m | £1.17m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £209.93k | £85.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £515.42k | £533.36k | £608.05k | £891.78k | £900.29k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £115.73k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £678.93k | £317.92k | £399.17k | £336.73k | £325.01k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £126.61k | £33.30k | £21.03k | £5.65k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.06k | £19.09k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.27m | £959.18k | £842.67k | £1.01m | £1.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £48.35k | £44.45k | £1.60k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.76k | £10.76k | £7.52k | £8.52k | £8.64k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £75.82k | £52.14k | £33.42k | £60.63k | £69.84k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.20m | £1.05m | £1.10m | £1.14m | £1.10m | |
|
Other assets | £155.85k | £163.41k | £571.17k | £425.14k | £411.49k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £380.87k | £390.50k | £583.29k | £248.89k | £130.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Pauls Church
Queen Caroline Street
Hammersmith
London
W6 9PJ
- Phone:
- 07713653765
- Email:
- church@sph.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window