Financial history SHARE PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity number: 1130400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £132.76k £198.58k £159.13k £113.52k £139.32k
Total expenditure £119.83k £165.26k £151.67k £168.04k £167.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £43.47k