THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES CARLISLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity though sermons, courses and small groups. Christian assemblies. Youth club with Christian ethos. Promoting Christianity through the staging of events, meetings, and literature. Promoting the whole mission of the church through activities for a wide range of groups. Supporting other charities in UK and overseas. Community outreach.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
Governance
- 04 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JAMES PCC, CARLISLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Simon Craufurd Bickersteth BA | Chair | 03 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sara Kierman | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Goldie | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Harper | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Selina Harper | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Graham | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walford | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Edwards | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Druce | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Orchard | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nina Orchard | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jason Crooks | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK ROBERT HURLEY | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Susan Browne | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jayne Mitchell | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOAN YARKER | Trustee | 25 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MCVITTIE | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES JOHNSTON | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN ROBINSON ACA CTA | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|||||
MISS KATE DAVIDSON | Trustee | 20 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.19k | £349.72k | £329.04k | £335.70k | £383.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £305.10k | £299.83k | £325.30k | £359.35k | £385.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £52.51k | £47.03k | £12.03k | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
ST. JAMES CHURCH
ST. JAMES ROAD
CARLISLE
CA2 5PD
- Phone:
- 01228810616
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window