Taff Wenallt Ministry Area

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Ministry Area promotes the mission of the Anglican Communion and spread the Gospel to the people of Whitchurch, Rhiwbina, Birchgrove and Llandaff North. The Benefice also provides pastoral care, including visiting the sick and local schools, and carries out baptisms, weddings and funerals. Funds have been raised for various charities in all four of the churches within the Benefice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 09 June 2009: Standard registration
- All Saints Church Llandaff North (Working name)
- St Marys Church Whitchurch (Working name)
- St Thomas Church General Fund (Working name)
- Taff Wenallt Ministry Area (Working name)
- Vicar and Chapel Wardens All Saints Church Rhiwbina (Working name)
- THE RECTORIAL BENEFICE OF WHITCHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valerie Bradshaw | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Annette Jones | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Hall | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Magee | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Alfred David Gill | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Anna Harwood | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Benedict Yates | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Jones | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev John Davis | Trustee | 14 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Lewis | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHRYN BARR | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|||||
KATHRYN MARGARET LAWLEY | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rev Peter Mortimer | Trustee | 15 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoffrey Edmund Foot | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alun Gwynne Jones | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.75k | £269.48k | £251.35k | £272.69k | £277.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £284.73k | £229.20k | £238.05k | £262.80k | £278.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF THE CHURCH IN WALES ADOPTED 31 MARCH 1920 as amended on 01 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
The promotion of the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical, in the parish.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Penlline Road
Cardiff
CF14 2AD
- Phone:
- 02920626072
- Email:
- office@twma.church
- Website:
-
churchinwales.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window