Financial history KNARESBOROUGH SPA BATHS FUND

Charity number: 500336
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/01/2020 17/01/2021 17/01/2022 17/01/2023 17/01/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £1.09k £1.09k £1.26k £1.50k
Total expenditure £1.44k £500 £1.00k £1.66k £1.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A