THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM

Charity number: 1131575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote in the parish of Grantham the whole mission of the Church of England, in daily worship of God, in matters pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical to serve the people of the town and all who come to the church building.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £492,964
Total expenditure: £458,245

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • GRANTHAM, ST WULFRAM'S PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Antony Osborn Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Janet Ruth Burrows Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Ese Vivian Oduyoye Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Tom Edward Fletcher Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Lucy May Scott Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Valerie Doska York Trustee 12 May 2024
THE FRIENDS OF ST. WULFRAM'S CHURCH, GRANTHAM
Received: 63 days late
Christine Anne Impey Trustee 01 July 2023
THE TRING CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Received: On time
Cherry Anne EDWARDS OBE Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Mark Amos Bates Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Helen Margaret DAWKINS Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
Anna James Trustee 14 May 2023
FRIENDS OF BELMONT SCHOOL- GRANTHAM
Received: On time
Rev Hannah Rebecca Grivell Trustee 26 June 2022
GRANTHAM FOODBANK
Received: On time
Rev Kate Hazel Hough Trustee 26 June 2022
None on record
Eileen West Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Lucille Margaret Pritchard Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Philip James Joyce Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Kathryn Jayne Ann Castaneda Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Michael John Richard Knight Trustee 08 May 2022
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
Rev James Clabern Roundtree Trustee 04 May 2021
THE PHILIP LANK TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST AND BOARD OF FINANCE LTD
Received: On time
Melanie Fletcher Trustee 23 April 2017
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
Dr JOHN BERNARD Manterfield Trustee 19 April 2015
THE FRIENDS OF ST. WULFRAM'S CHURCH, GRANTHAM
Received: 63 days late
GRANTHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Stuart Cradduck Trustee 10 April 2014
THE FRIENDS OF ST. WULFRAM'S CHURCH, GRANTHAM
Received: 63 days late
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
THE PHILIP LANK TRUST
Received: On time
PAUL CHARLES CHRISTOPHER DAVIE Trustee 19 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £677.98k £201.16k £328.49k £349.66k £492.96k
Total expenditure £361.36k £255.18k £386.86k £485.63k £458.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £17.55k £71.40k £18.34k £3.12k
Income - Donations and legacies £555.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £91.61k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £18.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £25.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £12.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £350.10k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £309.64k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £51.72k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £480 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £1.71k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 17 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RECTORY
CHURCH STREET
GRANTHAM
NG31 6RR
Phone:
01476 561342