THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RINGMER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral work inc. visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and groups Promotion of Christianity through events, meetings and literature Promotion of the Church's mission via activities for parents and children Supporting other charities in UK & abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 28 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
- RINGMER PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID WALTER BOUSKILL | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH FREDERICK BARBER MR | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ANDREW ROBERT EDGAR | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN McLEAN GEBBIE OBE DL | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LINEHAN | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HELEN COLEBOURN | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|||||
DEIRDRE BOOTH | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret SWEATMAN | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANN SQUIRES | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH PETER HUMM | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martine Francoise Bailey | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELIZABETH FRANKLIN | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD VINCENT | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.46k | £99.66k | £109.57k | £175.27k | £120.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.95k | £121.33k | £143.97k | £256.39k | £185.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
VICARAGE WAY
RINGMER
LEWES
BN8 5LA
- Phone:
- 01273812243
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window