Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, EAST TWICKENHAM

Charity number: 1131378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.04m £1.03m £1.31m £1.24m £1.25m
Total expenditure £978.29k £1.07m £1.33m £1.30m £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £19.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £955.40k £935.11k £1.13m £1.00m £1.04m
Income - Other trading activities £56.64k £74.97k £147.26k £179.59k £164.65k
Income - Charitable activities £8.88k £16.03k £34.58k £50.42k £35.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £599 £69 £1.74k £6.01k £7.36k
Income - Other £19.81k £0 £0 £151 £4.15k
Income - Legacies £2.18k £50.00k £113.78k £21.00k £33.08k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £978.29k £1.07m £1.33m £1.30m £1.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £83.67k
Expenditure - Governance £14.00k £11.00k £12.80k £13.00k £21.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £174.37k £161.46k £209.16k £207.42k £158.17k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0