CAISTOR ROMAN PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of the public in the history and archaeology of Caistor Roman town in Norfolk and its surrounding region. There have been two major programmes running during the period: field walking in the area0001
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Walker Woodman | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Mary Atherton | Trustee | 09 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Rhiane Keeley | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lowton | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Cossey | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robin Pinner | Trustee | 17 October 2013 |
|
|||||
WENDY ELIZABETH BYLETT | Trustee | 19 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Professor William Bowden | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.06k | £26.91k | £24.91k | £18.05k | £29.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.21k | £15.37k | £20.83k | £24.55k | £20.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 January 2025 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 30 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF CAISTOR ROMAN TOWN IN NORFOLK AND ITS SURROUNDING REGION"
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 Tavistock Drive
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 5BE
- Phone:
- 07944839557
- Email:
- info@caistorromanproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window