Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY-LE-BOW, CHEAPSIDE

Charity Number: 1130098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £157.12k £509.50k £270.77k £273.15k £504.90k
Total expenditure £124.40k £212.62k £282.14k £305.80k £288.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £39.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £18.58k N/A N/A £73.29k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £46.32k N/A N/A £61.20k
Income - Other N/A £444.60k N/A N/A £370.41k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £212.62k N/A N/A £288.77k