PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY-LE-BOW, CHEAPSIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship and associated activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
Governance
- 11 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY-LE-BOW PCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Harkin | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mistry | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hovell | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Snow | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Saunders | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Giles French | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Ryan | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Burchell | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Margaret Burtt | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAN HEDLEY | Trustee | 30 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANTOINE WEST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WAINWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
James Sanders | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £391.60k | £157.12k | £509.50k | £270.77k | £273.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £716.51k | £124.40k | £212.62k | £282.14k | £305.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £39.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £18.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £46.32k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £444.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £212.62k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARY LE BOW CHURCH
CHEAPSIDE
LONDON
EC2V 6AU
- Phone:
- 02072485139
- Email:
- info@stmarylebow.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window