THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAINT SWITHUN, PURLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Swithun's P C C has the responsibility of cooperating with our Vicar in promoting within the parish the whole mission of the Church; pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. The P C C is also responsible for the maintenance of the church building, the church hall, and the surrounding grounds, and for ensuring that the parish's finances and accounting records are in good order.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST SWITHUN'S PCC (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fiona Margaret Weaver | Chair | 23 June 2013 |
|
|||||
Hazel Game | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charles Blair-Ford | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JENNY CAMERON BLAIR-FORD | Trustee | 20 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
John Yorke | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SANDFORD | Trustee |
|
||||||
EVANGELINE ALLI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BRIAN PAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.81k | £52.25k | £56.86k | £63.94k | £63.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.42k | £74.27k | £64.31k | £70.12k | £77.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 July 2024 | 270 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 November 2020 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Purley Knoll
PURLEY
Surrey
CR8 3AE
- Phone:
- 07926783242
- Email:
- ACC.ST.SWITHUNS@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window