THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST EGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved, teaching Christianity, promoting Christianity, promoting the whole mission of the Church in its community, supporting other Christian charities in UK and overseas, providing chaplaincy for a local college and providing groups to nurture young people in the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£703,848
Donations and legacies | £530.54k | |
Charitable activities | £157.71k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £15.59k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£643,489
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £643.49k | |
Other | £0 |
£5,878 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £643.49k | |
Retained for future use | £60.36k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £643.49k | |
Retained for future use | £66.24k |
People

18 Employee(s)
24 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S CHURCH EGHAM (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Lee | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Jonathan Audsley | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amanda Jane Shirnia | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Stuart | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gillies | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Holly Byles | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Callomon | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lynn Pool Wilson | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saman Ferminus Senanayake | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Langford | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Cresswell | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Tebboth | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Beer | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amin Deiry | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Tebboth | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kamani Hewagama | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Clement Sion Andrew Jones | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev William Campbell Bissett | Trustee | 25 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SARA HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Ann Benefield | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Margaret Johnson | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EMMANUEL KAHN | Trustee | 30 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CONRAD GEORGE STEPHEN BENEFIELD | Trustee | 26 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Keith Robert Malcouronne | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £909.18k | £917.92k | £867.32k | £692.72k | £703.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £548.94k | £532.17k | £510.98k | £572.66k | £643.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £118.61k | £116.90k | £92.01k | £116.90k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £745.21k | £774.98k | £738.28k | £541.27k | £530.54k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £43 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £159.44k | £136.66k | £124.84k | £148.79k | £157.71k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.49k | £6.28k | £4.20k | £2.65k | £15.59k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £15.00k | £0 | £92.61k | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £548.94k | £532.17k | £510.98k | £572.66k | £643.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.00k | £5.40k | £5.70k | £6.87k | £10.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £38.52k | £37.57k | £47.31k | £67.06k | £51.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.27m | £6.27m | £6.27m | £6.27m | £6.27m | |
|
Long-term investments | £57.52k | £61.49k | £70.31k | £62.08k | £67.96k | |
|
Other assets | £101.60k | £198.34k | £270.01k | £275.26k | £209.39k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.77m | £1.48m | £1.19m | £1.07m | £948.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Church Office
Manor Farm Lane
EGHAM
TW20 9HR
- Phone:
- 01784 605400
- Email:
- office@stjohnsegham.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window