THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, ALMONDSBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £50 from 1 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S, ALMONDSBURY (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Richard Jenkinson | Chair | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anjali Kanagaratnam | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Hine | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Pearson | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Elsie van Rossum | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thelma May Gibbs | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Jefferis | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra Mary Thompson | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Rosemary Radburn Griffiths | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John Nicholas Roach | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE TIERNEY | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Quinton Avery | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Lorna Jefferis | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
ASTRID MARIE DOMINGO MOLYNEUX | Trustee | 17 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul Anthony van Rossum | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.13k | £105.68k | £108.10k | £95.21k | £103.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £393.37k | £172.35k | £125.82k | £126.72k | £75.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.60k | £6.71k | £2.92k | £50 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church
Church Road
Almondsbury
BRISTOL
BS32 4DT
- Phone:
- 01454618053
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window