THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, SKIPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Provision of youth groups. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- HOLY TRINITY PCC, SKIPTON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Canon Dr James William Fletcher Theodosius | Chair | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Peel Breare | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin Garner | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Douglas James Rice-Bowen | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Filby | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Anne Bundock | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Maloney | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Turner | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Gregory | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katrina Mattock CH/WARDEN | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
James Edward Gould CH/WARDEN | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
John Charles Dobson | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES WROOT | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Breare | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|||||
LINDA LIGGETT | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.93k | £94.93k | £109.92k | £177.27k | £177.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.46k | £86.19k | £125.79k | £170.17k | £170.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £967 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rectory Cottage
Rectory Lane
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 1ER
- Phone:
- 01756 793622
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window