Financial history Havant and Emsworth United Reformed Church Charity

Charity number: 1130507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £235.47k £77.33k £68.52k £98.64k £111.70k
Total expenditure £107.25k £95.52k £98.62k £95.28k £97.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £868 N/A N/A N/A