Financial history ST MICHAELS WITHOUT

Charity number: 1130721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £218.08k £226.35k £272.13k £314.78k £334.79k
Total expenditure £204.48k £234.57k £269.85k £323.13k £321.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £29.58k £8.88k N/A N/A N/A