THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS' HALIFAX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England Services; Church related meetings; Outreach to the community; Mother & Toddler Group; Youth Group;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
Governance
- 09 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Mullen | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ingham | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
KEITH APPLEYARD | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yolande Shire | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Herbert Smith | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Pemberton | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Underwood | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Llewellyn | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Henderson | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Appleyard | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ewan MacGregor | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blackwell | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Ann Middleton | Trustee | 31 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Gerrard | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diane Williams | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Bates | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|||||
PAUL GUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GREAVES | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|||||
IAN BYFIELD | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN STEPHEN BOUCKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £210.91k | £116.40k | £102.00k | £101.45k | £109.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.33k | £116.27k | £94.00k | £126.16k | £120.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints' Church
Dudwell Lane
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 0SD
- Phone:
- 01422353103
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window