THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PARKSTONE SAINT PETER AND SAINT OSMUND WITH BRANKSEA SAINT MARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL PERSONAL PRAYER PASTORAL WORK TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS,COURSES,ETC RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS PROVISION OF A YOUTH CLUB WITH CHRISTIAN ETHOS PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH THROUGH PROVISION OF ACTIVITIES FOR SENIOR CITIZENS, PARENTS AND TODDLERS AND OTHER SPECIAL NEED GROUPS SUPPORTING CHARITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,920 from 3 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 26 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 28 May 2025: Funds received from 1173993 THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S CHURCH PARKSTONE.
- P C C OF ST.PETER'S (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Edwin Trotman | Chair | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Alexandra Bartlett | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Way | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Elaine Margaret McCourt | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Walkley Balaam | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heidi TROTMAN | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Rosa Bessant | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Maurice Thompson | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kristen Mark St John Cann | Trustee | 24 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ellison | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Matthew Southgate | Trustee | 17 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
David John Holliday | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
June Violet Davis | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Clive Philip BALAAM BSc,PGCE | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.57k | £353.76k | £168.56k | £215.60k | £411.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.92k | £143.32k | £144.72k | £247.11k | £440.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.86k | N/A | £1.48k | N/A | £8.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parish Office
St Peter's Church
Church Road
Parkstone
Poole
BH14 0NN
- Phone:
- 01202 749085
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window