Financial history THE ALAN BODY AND CYRIL BODY TRUST

Charity Number: 1133557
Charity reporting is up to date (93 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £27.87k £20.68k £21.69k £21.84k £21.18k
Total expenditure £11.26k £21.76k £10.86k £19.96k £29.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A