THE ALAN BODY AND CYRIL BODY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist poor higher education students at Cardiff University and elsewhere to take up and pursue their studies by the award of bursaries and provision of other financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2010: Standard registration
- 09 July 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 November 2012: Re-registered
- ACB TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ivor Bradley Body | Chair |
|
||||||
Florence Eleanor Body | Trustee | 09 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr RUTH GROVES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ELIZABETH HASSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IMOGEN KATHARINE CLOUT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.87k | £20.68k | £21.69k | £21.84k | £21.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.26k | £21.76k | £10.86k | £19.96k | £29.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 December 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 December 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST POOR HIGHER EDUCATION STUDENTS AT CARDIFF UNIVERSITY AND ELSEWHERE TO TAKE UP AND PURSUE THEIR STUDIES BY THE AWARD OF BURSARIES AND PROVISION OF OTHER FINANCIAL SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
CARDIFF UNIVERSITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Pelican
Wesley Street
LLANTWIT MAJOR
South Glamorgan
CF61 1RA
- Phone:
- 07850 609423
- Email:
- body.david@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window