THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALMONDBURY WITH FARNLEY TYAS TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church of England Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 05 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Joanne Coffey | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HILARY POLLARD | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Gordon Thompson | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Felicity Gabrielle Cowling - Green | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Edwards | Trustee | 15 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER MAUREEN HINCHLIFFE | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Corinne Lord | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HELEN MARSHALL | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LINDA SMITH | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Jane Elizabeth Dutton | Trustee | 20 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE MARY BALL | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HARTLEY WILKINSON | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
MONICA JANE WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIAN LOCITA BECKLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £172.76k | £221.35k | £221.90k | £172.56k | £161.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £219.68k | £231.12k | £228.43k | £153.51k | £254.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 December 2021 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Thorpe Lane
HUDDERSFIELD
HD5 8UF
- Phone:
- 01484349468
- Email:
- ahwilkinson1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window