THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JAMES, TAUNTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity. Taking religious assemblies in schools. The provision of a youth club and activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other special need groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC TAUNTON ST JAMES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Fabian Rene Marc Wuyts | Chair | 14 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Price | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Smit | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Margaret Hope | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Irene Jones | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Derek Bright | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vashti Wuyts Smit | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Thomas Jordan | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rickard | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD SAINSBURY | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER IAN FENTON | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GERTRUDE ELIZABETH WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD MARTIN CARPENTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN PERCIVAL WAKEFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.40k | £228.54k | £135.50k | £146.33k | £162.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.85k | £157.13k | £163.55k | £161.89k | £170.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £100 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES CHURCH OFFICE
ST. JAMES STREET
TAUNTON
TA1 1JS
- Phone:
- 01823272931
- Email:
- info@stjamestaunton.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window