Financial history CHRIST CHURCH UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHELMSFORD CHARITY

Charity number: 1131065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £211.59k £221.67k £223.17k £198.20k £209.81k
Total expenditure £235.05k £207.79k £265.88k £237.68k £298.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.68k £20.57k N/A N/A N/A