THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bromley
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY, SHORTLANDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Nicola Fox | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Helen Jane Bird | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Evans | Trustee | 11 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Philip Thomas Edmondson | Trustee | 06 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Craig Benjamin Myers | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Tillotson | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Shirley Dalton | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Slaney | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bingham | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Sherman | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet Boam | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH MILLS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ROBIN HOGG | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN-MARIE JEFFERYS | Trustee | 29 April 2009 |
|
|||||
Timothy Dawson | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CHASE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253.41k | £261.73k | £226.95k | £227.32k | £209.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.75k | £198.21k | £202.05k | £205.99k | £201.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church House
St. Marys Avenue
BROMLEY
BR2 0PU
- Phone:
- 02084605884
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window