Financial history ST NEOTS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH

Charity number: 1130767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £58.01k £67.59k £58.19k £93.04k £64.05k
Total expenditure £62.90k £54.16k £81.67k £75.51k £65.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k N/A